skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 29/11/21 13:41:38 PM

Plotkin, Anna

CPSO#: 86970

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 18 Feb 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Leningrad Paediatric Medical Institute, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: 4164806100 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Anna Plotkin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 09 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Plotkin ( CPSO# 86970 )

Business Address:
2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5

Business Address:
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-1100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre,Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective:30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANNA PLOTKIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PLOTKIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
AVP - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Feb 2011