THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/12/23 6:29:10 AM
Gladstone, Julie Anne
CPSO#:
86946
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
19 Jan 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Jan 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Wood, Julie Anne (used until: 06 May 2008 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
711 Concession St
Juravinski Hospital
Palliative Care
Hamilton ON L8V 1C3
Phone: 905-521-2100 Ext. 42213
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation,St. Peter's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:07 Jan 2010 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JULIE ANNE GLADSTONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GLADSTONE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jan 2010 |