THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 5:30:19 AM
Cypel, Tatiana Karine Simon
CPSO#:
86911
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of
31 Dec 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
01 Jan 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Federal University of Rio Grande Do Sul, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 10 Sep 2007
PEAP - CF - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 11 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
CF - Plastic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Sep 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 26 Aug 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 26 Aug 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Dec 2013 |