THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 13:23:02 PM
Bozanovic, Radenka
CPSO#:
86900
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Aug 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Aug 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Bozanovic-Sosic, Radenka (used until: 19 Aug 2007 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Bosnian, English
Education: University of Sarajevo, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Health Sciences
Department of Anatomical Pathology
1200 Main Street W
Hamilton ON L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 73645
Fax: (905) 577-0198
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:30 May 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RADENKA BOZANOVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOZANOVIC is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Aug 2013 |