THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 10:10:01 AM
Ge, Hong
CPSO#:
86899
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Jun 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Jun 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Chinese, English
Education: Second Military Medical University, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Pacific Medical Clinic
Unit F33
4300 Steeles Avenue East
Markham ON L3R 0Y5
Phone: (905) 604-7889
Fax: (905) 604-7890
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:22 Jun 2010 |
CFPC Specialist |
Public Health and Preventive Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HONG GE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Community Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jun 2010 |