THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 10:23:57 AM
Malik, Shiraz Akram
CPSO#:
86890
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Aug 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Panjabi/Punjabi
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Victoria Hospital
London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 54487
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
St Joseph's Health Care, London |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:06 Jul 2009 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHIRAZ AKRAM MALIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALIK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Palliative Care Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Aug 2009 |