skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 05/08/21 6:58:02 AM

Palao, France Antoniette

CPSO#: 86885

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 09 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cebuano, English, Tagalog

Education:University of The Visayas, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
106 Victoria Street West
Alliston ON  L9R 1Y7
Phone: (705) 435-0077
Fax: (705) 435-1177 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: France Palao Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 17 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Palao ( CPSO# 86885 )

Business Address:
106 Victoria Street West
Alliston ON  L9R 1Y7
Phone Number: (705) 435-0077

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:19 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. FRANCE ANTONIETTE PALAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PALAO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
AVP - Family Medicine

Western University, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2009