skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 24/07/21 4:26:40 AM

Mozzon, Jeremy Bradley

CPSO#: 86870

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Western University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Fort William FHO
1260 Golf Links Road, Suite 201
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 0A1
Phone: (807) 626-1234
Fax: (807) 623-8832 Electoral District: 09

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Jeremy Mozzon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 22 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Mozzon ( CPSO# 86870 )

Business Address:
Fort William FHO
1260 Golf Links Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 0A1
Phone Number: (807) 626-1234

Business Address:
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Atikokan General Hospital Atikokan
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
Geraldton District Hospital Geraldton
La Verendrye Hospital,Riverside Health Care Facilities Fort Frances
McCausland Hospital Terrace Bay
Nipigon District Memorial Hospital Nipigon
St Joseph's Care Group,Thunder Bay Thunder Bay
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Wilson Memorial General Hospital Marathon

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:19 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JEREMY BRADLEY MOZZON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOZZON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2009