THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 1:24:14 AM
McMaster, Robert George
CPSO#:
86869
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
31 Dec 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 Dec 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
278 Jane St
Toronto ON M6S 3Z2
Phone: 4165358501 Ext. 30195
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health - College Street Site |
Toronto |
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:31 Dec 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Forensic Psychiatry |
Effective:26 Sep 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ROBERT GEORGE MCMASTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCMASTER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Dec 2013 |