skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 08/12/21 20:10:17 PM

Bayanati, Hamid -

CPSO#: 86854

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 Jan 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Jan 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:AHWAZ UNIVERSITY OF MEDICAL SCIENCES, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department of Diagnostic Radiology
Module S
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 73249 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

Renfrew Victoria Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Radiology
499 Raglan Street North
Renfrew ON  K7V 1P6
Canada
Phone: (613) 432-4851
County: County of Renfrew
Electoral District: 07

Winchester District Memorial
Hospital
Department of Diagnositc Radiology
566 Louise Street
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0
Canada
County: County of Stormont, Dundas and Glengarry
Electoral District: 07

Almonte General Hospital
75 Spring Street
Almonte ON  K0A 1A0
Canada
County: County of Lanark
Electoral District: 07

Arnprior & District Memorial
Hospital
350 John Street North
Arnprior ON  K7S 2P6
Canada
County: County of Renfrew
Electoral District: 07

St. Francis Memorial Hospital
7 St. Francis Memorial Drive
Barrys Bay ON  K0J 1T0
Canada
County: County of Renfrew
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. H. Bayanati Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 09 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Bayanati ( CPSO# 86854 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital - General Campus
Department of Diagnostic Radiology
Module S
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HAMID - BAYANATI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAYANATI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
AVP - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Feb 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Jan 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 2015