THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 8:06:55 AM
Fung, Sharon
CPSO#:
86847
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
10 Aug 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
26 Nov 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: St. George's University School of Medici, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:12 Main Street North
Markham ON L3P 1X2
Date Received: 10 Aug 2016
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
AVP - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 03 Nov 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
University of Toronto, 04 Nov 2011 to 03 Nov 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
University of Toronto, 04 Nov 2012 to 31 Mar 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Mar 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 26 Nov 2013 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 10 Aug 2016 |