THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 16:08:23 PM
Blair, Amy Elizabeth
CPSO#:
86769
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
French, Amy Elizabeth (used until: 19 Feb 2014 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Toronto, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
305-840 Coxwell Ave
Toronto Allergy Group
MGH - Medical Centre
Toronto ON M4C 5T2
Phone: 4164657999
Fax: 4164618999
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Health Sciences North |
Sudbury |
Toronto East Health Network |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Clinical Immunology and Allergy |
Effective:27 Oct 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AMY ELIZABETH BLAIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLAIR is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 23 Apr 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2012 |