THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 12:04:53 PM
Porter, Sara Lara
CPSO#:
86755
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Oct 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Queen's University, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Providence Care Hospital
752 King Street West
Adult mental health services
Parkside 0
Kingston ON K7L 4X3
Phone: (613) 544-4900
Fax: 613-540-8794
Electoral District: 06
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: S. Porter Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 5 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Providence Care Centre |
Kingston |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:21 Dec 2010 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SARA LARA PORTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PORTER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 19 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 20 Oct 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 15 Nov 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 16 Nov 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 17 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Oct 2012 |