skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 01/08/21 7:15:29 AM

Bojcevski, Alexandra Tanya

CPSO#: 86746

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 12 Oct 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Western University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1 Ormond St S
Thorold ON  L2V 1X9
Phone: 905-935-0312
Fax: 905-935-2949 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

St. Catharines General Hospital
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S0A9
Canada
Phone: 905-378-4647
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: A. Bojcevski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 24 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Bojcevski ( CPSO# 86746 )

Business Address:
464 Welland Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2M 5V4
Phone Number: (905) 935-0312

Business Address:
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Business Address:
Suite 114
7885 McLead Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2H 0G5

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:28 Feb 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ALEXANDRA TANYA BOJCEVSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOJCEVSKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 24 Nov 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 25 Nov 2013 to 28 Feb 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Oct 2011