THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 2:28:32 AM
Farag, George Abdalla Reyad
CPSO#:
86741
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Tanta University, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Cardio Care
Heart institute
Lower level
481London Road
Sarnia ON N7T 4X3
Phone: (519) 541-0030
Fax: (519) 339-0993
Electoral District: 01
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Egypt
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Bluewater Health |
Sarnia |
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare |
Windsor |
Windsor Regional Hospital |
Windsor |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:02 Oct 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GEORGE ABDALLA REYAD FARAG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FARAG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 23 Sep 2007
AVP - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 24 Sep 2007 to 29 Feb 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Mar 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Apr 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 May 2009 to 30 Apr 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 May 2010 to 30 Apr 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 May 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2012 |