THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 8:26:27 AM
Hosseini, Seyed Hossein
CPSO#:
86739
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
31 Jul 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 Jul 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi
Education: BABOL UNIVERSITY OF HEALTH SCIENCES, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Regional Rehabilitation Centre
Dept Physicial Med and Rehab
300 Wellington Street North
Hamilton ON L8L 0A4
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 40815
Fax: (905) 577-8233
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation |
Effective:07 Jun 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SEYED HOSSEIN HOSSEINI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOSSEINI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 23 Sep 2007
AVP - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
McMaster University, 24 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Sep 2012
CF - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 24 Aug 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 27 Aug 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Jul 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Jul 2013 |