THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 21:06:39 PM
Cohen-Gelfand, Sara Nancy
CPSO#:
86718
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Sep 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Sep 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Toronto, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 303
343 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON M3H 1T1
Phone: (416) 785-8412
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:03 May 2010 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SARA NANCY COHEN-GELFAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COHEN-GELFAND is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 May 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 09 May 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 10 May 2009 to 09 May 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 May 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 09 May 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Sep 2010 |