skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 23/10/21 0:59:49 AM

Shah, Meera

CPSO#: 86679

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 08 Mar 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
45 Overlea Blvd, Unit B7
Toronto ON  M4H1C3
Phone: 4164216369
Fax: 6477299955 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Meera Shah Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 07 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Shah ( CPSO# 86679 )

Business Address:
Scarborough General Hospital
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 438-2011

Business Address:
Scarborough Hospital
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Phone Number: (416) 495-2400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:29 Mar 2010 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:19 Oct 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MEERA SHAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 28 Mar 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 29 Mar 2010 to 31 Mar 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 2011