THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 18:01:26 PM
Hofer, Michael
CPSO#:
86657
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Jun 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
24 Jun 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Czech, English
Education: Charles Univ Prague, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
11 Stover Street North
PO Box 147
Norwich ON N0J 1P0
Phone: 226-325-0108
Fax: 226-325-2268
Electoral District: 02
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:02 Mar 2010 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 08 Jun 2007 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 08 Jun 2007 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 07 Jun 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Jan 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Jun 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 24 Jun 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Apr 2012 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 16 Apr 2012 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Apr 2012 |
|
Active |