THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 10:48:55 AM
Marin, Alina
CPSO#:
86616
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Jul 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French, German, Romanian
Education: Institute Medicine, Pharmacy,Timisoara, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Hotel Dieu Hospital
Adult Outpatient Psychiatry
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON K7L 5G2
Phone: (613) 544 3400 Ext. 2567
Fax: (613) 544 9666
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Providence Care Centre |
Kingston |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:27 Nov 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Dec 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
|
Active |