skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 05/08/21 13:34:11 PM

Peterson, Sean Richard Daniel

CPSO#: 86555

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Western University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
481 London Rd
Sarnia ON  N7T 4X3
Phone: 519-337-7512
Fax: 519-337-3257 Electoral District: 01

Additional Practice Location(s)

BWH ER
89 Norman St
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Canada
Phone: 519-464-4400 Ext. 5214
Fax: 519-339-7264
County: County of Lambton
Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Sean Peterson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 22 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Peterson ( CPSO# 86555 )

Business Address:
481 London Road
Sarnia ON  N7T 4X3
Phone Number: (519) 337-7512

Business Address:
Bluewater Health
Emergency
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Phone Number: (519) 464-4400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health Sarnia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:19 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SEAN RICHARD DANIEL PETERSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PETERSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2009