skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 05/08/21 6:20:07 AM

Malhotra, Gurpreet Singh

CPSO#: 86528

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 26 Jan 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 26 Jan 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Gulbarga University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
MCQUEEN Clinic
3-8975 McLaughlin Rd South
Brampton
Brampton ON  L6Y-0Z6
Phone: 905-451-7863
Fax: 905-451-7862 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Gurpreet Singh Malhotra Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 23 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Malhotra ( CPSO# 86528 )

Business Address:
Unit 3
8975 Mclaughlin Road
Brampton ON  L6Y 0Z6
Phone Number: (905) 451-7863

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:09 Dec 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. GURPREET SINGH MALHOTRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALHOTRA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 23 Sep 2007
AVP - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Jan 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jan 2010