skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 29/07/21 8:32:46 AM

Lee, Hae Mi

CPSO#: 86501

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 Jan 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Jan 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Western University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 405
1919 Riverside Dr.
Ottawa ON  K1H 1A2
Phone: (613) 7025333
Fax: (613) 7025577 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Hae Mi Lee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 23 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Lee ( CPSO# 86501 )

Business Address:
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-2000

Business Address:
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Business Address:
60 Cornelia Street West
Smiths Falls ON  K7A 2H9
Phone Number: (613) 283-2330

Business Address:
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Business Address:
1967 Riverside Dr.
Ottawa ON  K1H 1W9

Business Address:
405 - 1919 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 1A2
Phone Number: (613) 702-5333

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective:31 Dec 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HAE MI LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

Western University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

Western University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 08 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

Western University, 09 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 09 Jan 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

Western University, 10 Jan 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 2013