THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 8:42:59 AM
Udupa, Sharmila
CPSO#:
86494
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
14 Aug 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Aug 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of Eastern Onta
Division of Cardiology
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
Phone: 613-737-7600 Ext. 3257
Fax: 613-738-4835
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Pediatric Cardiology |
Effective:08 Oct 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHARMILA UDUPA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. UDUPA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 01 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 02 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 01 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 02 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 7 - Pediatric Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 01 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 7 - Pediatric Cardiology
University of Toronto, 02 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Pediatric Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Aug 2015 |