THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/09/23 13:24:22 PM
Lines, Matthew Alexander
CPSO#:
86482
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Aug 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
14 Jan 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Calgary, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: M.A. Lines Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 22 2019
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:
C H E O
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
Date Received: 01 May 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Medical Genetics and Genomics |
Effective:30 Jun 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 28 Feb 2014
CF - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jan 2013 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Aug 2019 |