THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 19:46:39 PM
McDonald, Charles Robert Joey
CPSO#:
86479
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
09 Aug 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Aug 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Joey McDonald Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 14 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Vascular Surgery |
Effective:30 Sep 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Vascular Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 7 - Vascular Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Aug 2012 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 09 Aug 2022 |