THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 7:00:07 AM
Husain, Saima Fathima
CPSO#:
86469
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 Feb 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Feb 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Hindi, Urdu
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1245 Lakeshore Rd
Burlington ON L7S 0A2
Phone: 9056323737
Fax: 9056814808
Electoral District: 04
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:701-4980 Kingsway
Burnaby, BC V5H 4K7
Date Received: 19 Jun 2017
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
Joseph Brant Hospital |
Burlington |
Niagara Health System |
Niagara Falls |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:14 Jun 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SAIMA FATHIMA HUSAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUSAIN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Aug 2012 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 19 Jun 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Feb 2018 |