THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/12/23 10:09:29 AM
McVicar, Jason Alan Joseph
CPSO#:
86456
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Aug 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Manitoba, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department Of Anesthesiology
Critical Care Wing 1401
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8187
Fax: (613) 737-8189
Electoral District: 07
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Manitoba
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,General Site |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:17 Aug 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JASON ALAN JOSEPH MCVICAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCVICAR is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 18 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 19 Aug 2011 to 17 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 18 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Aug 2012 |