THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 21:39:55 PM
Hainer, Tammy Lynne
CPSO#:
86444
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Mar 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Wilson, Tammy Lynne (used until: 27 Jan 2009 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Tillsonburg Medical Centre
200 Broadway Street
Tillsonburg, ON
Tillsonburg ON N4G 5A7
Phone: (519) 842-4231
Fax: (519) 842-3793
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital |
Tillsonburg |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Mar 2010 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. TAMMY LYNNE HAINER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAINER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2009 to 04 Apr 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Mar 2010 |