skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 01/08/21 6:24:42 AM

Ainsworth, Kelly Elizabeth

CPSO#: 86431

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Health Sciences
Department of Radiology
PO Box 2000
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4J9
Phone: 289-808-4534
Fax: (905) 521-5092 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Kelly Ainsworth Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 09 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Ainsworth ( CPSO# 86431 )

Business Address:
Hamilton Health Sciences
Department of Radiology
P.O. Box 2000
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4J9
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Pediatric Radiology Effective:26 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KELLY ELIZABETH AINSWORTH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AINSWORTH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 23 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2010 to 23 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2013