skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 26/07/21 16:50:35 PM

Chuen, Luan Lok-Yan

CPSO#: 86423

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:Queen's University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Christie Clinic
726 Bloor Street West, Suite B101
Toronto ON  M6G 4A1
Phone: (647) 350-5445
Fax: (647) 350-5446 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Rouge Valley Centenary Hospital
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Luan L. Chuen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 16 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Chuen ( CPSO# 86423 )

Business Address:
B101-726 Bloor Street West
Toronto ON  M6G 4A1
Phone Number: 647-350-5445

Business Address:
Unit B101
726 Bloor Street West
Toronto ON  M6G 4A1
Phone Number: (647) 350-5445

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Health Network, Centenary Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:25 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LUAN LOK-YAN CHUEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHUEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009