THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/12/23 14:16:18 PM
Sharifi, Shannon Elizabeth
CPSO#:
86369
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Jul 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
North Bay Regional Health Centre
50 College Drive
North Bay ON P1B 8G5
Phone: 7054748600
Electoral District: 08
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
North Bay Regional Health Centre |
North Bay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHANNON ELIZABETH SHARIFI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHARIFI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 07 Sep 2012
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jul 2012 |