THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 21:49:20 PM
Crookshank, Emily Dawn
CPSO#:
86334
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 Dec 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McMaster University, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Credit Valley Hospital
Trillium Health Partners
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-1100 Ext. 6858
Fax: 905-813-4229
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:31 Dec 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. EMILY DAWN CROOKSHANK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CROOKSHANK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 21 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 22 Dec 2011 to 21 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 22 Dec 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Dec 2012 |