THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 21:12:32 PM
Baibergenova, Akerke Tulegenovna
CPSO#:
86314
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Jul 2022
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Kazakh State Medical University, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
401 - 13291 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON L4E 4L6
Phone: (905) 773-1599
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Dermatology |
Effective:30 Jun 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AKERKE TULEGENOVNA BAIBERGENOVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAIBERGENOVA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
AVP - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2012 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 26 Apr 2022 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 26 Apr 2022 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jul 2022 |