THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/09/23 5:54:33 AM
Nasarullah, Fareeha
CPSO#:
86312
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Jun 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: Dow Medical College, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1 Hospital Court
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
Oshawa ON L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711 Ext. 4579
Fax: (905) 721-7763
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site |
Oshawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:19 Jun 2009 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. FAREEHA NASARULLAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NASARULLAH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
AVP - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 14 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jun 2009 |