THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 18:42:19 PM
Gomez Vargas, Andrew
CPSO#:
86291
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Sep 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Oct 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: National University of Colombia, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
125 Welland Avenue
St Catharines ON L2R 2N5
Phone: (905) 688-6289
Fax: (905) 688-0720
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:30 Jun 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANDREW GOMEZ VARGAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOMEZ VARGAS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 17 Sep 2007 to 07 Dec 2007
PEAP - CF - Neurology
McMaster University, 08 Dec 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Neurology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 23 Sep 2008
AVP - Neurology
McMaster University, 24 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 17 Sep 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 08 Dec 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jul 2013 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 29 Mar 2019 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 29 Mar 2019 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 30 Apr 2019 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 22 May 2019 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2020 |
Concerns
Source:
Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: February 21, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)
Source:
Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: February 21, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)