THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 19:45:28 PM
McKinnon, Allison Arlene
CPSO#:
86264
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Jun 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Jun 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 309
770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa ON K2A 3Z3
Phone: (613) 274-7831
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Queensway Carleton Hospital |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:07 Jun 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ALLISON ARLENE MCKINNON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCKINNON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 25 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 26 Aug 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 07 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 08 Jun 2010 to 07 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 08 Jun 2011 to 07 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 08 Jun 2012 to 07 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 07 Jun 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jun 2013 |