skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 28/10/21 4:42:17 AM

Gillis-Doyle, Jennifer Anne

CPSO#: 86246

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 17 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 May 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. J. Gillis-Doyle Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 14 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:28 Sep 2005 CFPC Specialist
Palliative Medicine Effective:25 Sep 2019 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 May 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Jun 2015