THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 5:08:00 AM
Bowen, Nadia Anne
CPSO#:
86245
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 Jan 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Jan 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Saskatchewan College of Me, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Sault Area Hospital
SAH Hospitalist Program
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste. Marie ON P6B 0A8
Phone: (705) 759-3434 Ext. 5352
Fax: (705) 759-3731
Electoral District: 08
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Nadia Bowen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 18 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sault Area Hospital |
Sault Ste. Marie |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:09 Dec 2009 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NADIA ANNE BOWEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOWEN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 20 Aug 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 29 Jan 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jan 2010 |