skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 26/06/22 1:25:34 AM

Morgan, Andrew William

CPSO#: 86203

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of British Columbia Faculty o, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3000-181 Bay St
Cleveland Clinic Canada
Toronto ON  M5J 2T3
Phone: 416-507-6600
Fax: 416-507-6610 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Andrew W. Morgan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 05 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Morgan ( CPSO# 86203 )

Business Address:
Michael Garron Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 461-8272

Business Address:
Durham Mental Health Services
519 Brock Street South
Whitby ON  L1N 4K8
Phone Number: (905) 666-0831

Business Address:
CMHA - Durhman 60 Bond Street West
Oshawa ON  L1G 1A5
Phone Number: (905) 436-8760

Business Address:
Cleveland Clinic Canada
3000-181 Bay St
Toronto ON  M5J 4T3
Phone Number: 416-507-6600


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Prince Edward Island

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Homewood Health Centre Guelph
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Forensic Psychiatry Effective:26 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANDREW WILLIAM MORGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORGAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012