THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 9:03:10 AM
Mohammed, Reem Walid Ahmed
CPSO#:
86166
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
31 Dec 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
18 Aug 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: King Faisal University, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Clinical Immunology and Allergy |
Effective:20 Oct 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 28 May 2007 to 17 Aug 2007
PEAP - R - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 18 Aug 2007 to 17 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 18 Aug 2008 to 17 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 18 Aug 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
CF - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 28 May 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Aug 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2012 |