skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/06/22 21:20:17 PM

Al Duhaiby, Eman Zuhair Omar

CPSO#: 86141

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Mar 2022
EXPIRY DATE
15 Mar 2025
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 15 Mar 2022

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic

Education: King Abdul Aziz University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
610 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9 Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 28 May 2007 to 06 Jul 2007
PEAP - R - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 07 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Sep 2013
CF - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
CF - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 28 May 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Mar 2022
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 15 Mar 2025

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 15 Mar 2022 Active
 1. Dr. EMAN ZUHAIR OMAR AL DUHAIBY may practise radiation oncology with Princess Margaret Cancer Centre in Toronto, Ontario, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires three years from the date of issuance.
 
3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr. AL DUHAIBY's knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide the required reports to the College by the due date or if the reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(ii) the supervisor is no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. AL DUHAIBY's practice.

Note: This certificate is issued on 15 March, 2022, and will expire on or before 15 March, 2025, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.