THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 4:18:18 AM
Wang, Yongdong
CPSO#:
86137
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Jul 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Mandarin
Education: Taishan Medical College, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University Health Science
Center
Department of Radiology
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 75182
Fax: (905) 521-1390
Electoral District: 04
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Yongdong Wang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 27 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:01 Jul 2018 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:01 Jul 2012 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 14 May 2007 to 18 Jul 2007
PEAP - CF - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 19 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2011 to 30 Apr 2012
CF - Paediatric Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 14 May 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jul 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 19 Jul 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 10 Aug 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 09 Nov 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Apr 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2018 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2018 |
|
Active |