skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 22/10/21 5:09:58 AM

Ilo, Mary de Porres

CPSO#: 86107

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Apr 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Apr 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Igbo, Italian

Education:Universita Cattolica del Sacro Cuore, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone: (519) 751-5544 Ext. 5858
Fax: (519) 751-5570 Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Brant Community Healthcare System,Willett Site Paris

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:06 Dec 2006 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:12 Oct 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARY DE PORRES ILO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ILO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Apr 2007