skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 22/10/21 9:37:52 AM

Koujok, Khaldoun

CPSO#: 86095

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 Apr 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 23 Apr 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Damascus Faculty of Medici, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ont
Department of Medical Imaging
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 3356
Fax: (613) 738-4811 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Khaldoun Koujok Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 24 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Koujok ( CPSO# 86095 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
St Francis Memorial Hospital Barrys Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:23 Apr 2007 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Pediatric Radiology Effective:05 Jun 2015 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Apr 2007
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Apr 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 22 Apr 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Apr 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Nov 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Apr 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Jun 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 05 Jun 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 05 Jun 2015 Active
 Dr. Khaldoun Koujok may practise medicine independently in diagnostic radiology
            and paediatric radiology.