skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/07/21 14:32:13 PM

Shin, Sharon Lee

CPSO#: 86061

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Oct 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Sep 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 120
7330 Yonge Street
Thornhill ON  L4J 7Y7
Phone: (905) 707-1777
Fax: (905) 707-0616 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Sharon Shin Medicine, Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 01 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Shin ( CPSO# 86061 )

Business Address:
Unit 120
7330 Yonge Street
Thornhill ON  L4J 7Y7
Phone Number: (905) 707-1777

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:16 May 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SHARON LEE SHIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 09 Apr 2007 to 04 May 2007
EL - Paediatric Radiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Oct 2010 to 30 Sep 2011
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Apr 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 May 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2011