THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 16:08:04 PM
Davies, Dafydd Alexander
CPSO#:
86052
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
05 Aug 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
23 May 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:
IWK Health Centre
5850-5980 University Avenue
PO Box 9700
Halifax, NS B3K 6R8
Date Received: 05 Aug 2014
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Pediatric Surgery |
Effective:04 Oct 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 02 Apr 2007 to 25 May 2007
EL - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 7 - Pediatric General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Apr 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 25 May 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 May 2013 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 05 Aug 2014 |