THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/10/23 9:18:16 AM
Leake, Pierre-Anthony Emile
CPSO#:
86036
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
30 Jun 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
26 Mar 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: University of the West Indies, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2007 to 15 Apr 2007
PEAP - R - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 16 Apr 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
EL - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2010 to 25 Mar 2010
PEAP - CF - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 26 Mar 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Apr 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Apr 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jan 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Mar 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2011 |