skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 21/10/20 20:19:34 PM

Satgunam, Shean

CPSO#: 86031

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Oct 2020
EXPIRY DATE
01 Oct 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Mar 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Birmingham, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Newfoundland and Labrador
USA - New York

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 02 Apr 2007 to 25 May 2007
EL - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Apr 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 May 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Mar 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Oct 2020
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Oct 2020

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: October 1, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Shean Satgunam to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective October 1, 2020:

Allegations of professional misconduct against Dr. Satgunam, including that he failed to provide complete and accurate information in his application to the College and in his applications for privileges at Ontario hospitals, were referred to the Discipline Committee. Dr. Satgunam denies the allegations and makes no admission of professional misconduct. Dr. Satgunam resigned from the College and has agreed not to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario for a minimum period of two (2) years.
Download Full Document (PDF)