skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 27/07/21 14:45:52 PM

Kalantari, Saeed

CPSO#: 86026

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 29 Apr 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 29 Apr 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi, Persian

Education:Islamic Azad University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 212
1110 Sheppard Avenue East
North York ON  M2K 2W2
Phone: (416) 730-1300
Fax: (416) 730-0600 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. S. Kalantari Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 20 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kalantari ( CPSO# 86026 )

Business Address:
Suite 212
1110 Sheppard Avenue East
North York ON  M2K 2W2
Phone Number: (416) 730-1300

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:09 Dec 2009 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 May 2007
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 May 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 14 May 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Apr 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Apr 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Jun 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Jun 2011

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 23 Jun 2011 Active
             Dr.  Saeed  Kalantari  may  practise medicine independently in Family Medicine,
            only.

Concerns

Source: Other
Active Date: January 12, 2021
Expiry Date:
Summary:
CHARGES

Saeed Kalantari was charged with the following offences:

1. Two counts of Sexual Assault, between August 1, 2019 and September 30, 2019, contrary to Section 271 of the Criminal Code of Canada.
2. Assault, on or about January 9, 2020, contrary to Section 266 of the Criminal Code of Canada.
3. Assault, on or about March 17, 2020, contrary to Section 266 of the Criminal Code of Canada.
4. Assault, on or about May 13, 2020, contrary to Section 266 of the Criminal Code of Canada.

Date of charge: November 10, 2020
Place of charge: Toronto, Ontario
Toronto Police Service

 

Source: Other
Active Date: January 12, 2021
Expiry Date:
Summary:
BAIL CONDITIONS

On November 10, 2020, the following conditions of release (bail conditions) were imposed on Saeed Kalantari:

1. Notify specified officer (or designate) within 24 hours of any change of your address or employment.
2. Do not communicate, directly or indirectly, with specified persons.
3. Do not go to specified places with specified exception.

 

Source: Other
Active Date: January 12, 2021
Expiry Date:
Summary:
CHARGES

Saeed Kalantari was charged with the following offence:

1. Assault, on or about July 3, 2020, contrary to Section 266 of the Criminal Code of Canada.

Date of charge: December 9, 2020
Place of charge: Toronto, Ontario
Toronto Police Service

 

Source: Other
Active Date: January 12, 2021
Expiry Date:
Summary:
BAIL CONDITIONS

On December 9, 2020, the following conditions of release (bail conditions) were imposed on Saeed Kalantari:

1. Notify specified officer at Toronto Police Service of any change in your address or cell phone.
2. Do not communicate, directly or indirectly with specified person subject to specified exception.
3. Do not enter the areas where you know specified person to live, work, go to school, frequent or any place you know the person to be.